U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-mj-01147-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harris
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
  • October 10, 2016: [Leave to Restrict]
  • October 10, 2016: [Exclude]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
  • September 29, 2016: [Leave to Restrict]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.