U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-mc-00201
  • Case Name: DaVita Inc. v. UnitedHealthcare of Florida, Inc et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Quash]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • October 12, 2016: [Leave to Restrict]
  • October 07, 2016: [Memorandum]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order]
  • October 06, 2016: [Leave to Restrict]
  • October 06, 2016: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.