U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-mc-00206
  • Case Name: HCB Financial Corp. v. Kennedy
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Minute Order]
  • August 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing/Conference]
  • August 17, 2017: [Hearing/Conference]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 19, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 19, 2017: [Extension of Time]
  • July 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 20, 2016: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.