U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-rj-00013
  • Case Name: Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Welfare Fund, et al., v. Altitude Fire Protection, LLC
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Judgment]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release of Funds]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Release of Funds]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Deposit Funds]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: [Deposit Funds]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.