U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-mc-00212
  • Case Name: Connectus LLC v. Ampush Media, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • December 14, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • November 14, 2016: [Minute Order]
  • November 10, 2016: [Quash]
  • November 01, 2016: [Memorandum]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.