U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-mc-00222
  • Case Name: Speidell v. USA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Enforce]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Ruling]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Quash]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 09, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Ruling]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 18, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • December 28, 2016: [Enforce]
  • December 28, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Memorandum]
  • November 23, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 08, 2016: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.