U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-mj-00135-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Exclude]
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Suppress ]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 04, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 09, 2016: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.