U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-mj-01161-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shryock
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Probation Superseding Petition Due to Violations of Supervision (No Warrant)]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 06, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Non-Guideline Sentence]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Counts]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 16, 2018: [Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 16, 2018: [Dismiss Counts]
  • January 11, 2018: [Non-Guideline Sentence]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 28, 2017: [Continue]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 09, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 23, 2017: [Continue]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 13, 2017: [Continue]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 14, 2016: [Declare Complex Case]
  • November 14, 2016: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.