U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-mj-01166-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Huxel
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Release Bond Obligation]
  • April 17, 2018: [Release Bond Obligation]
August, 2017
  • August 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Return of Property]
  • August 01, 2017: [Return of Property]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Departure]
  • March 27, 2017: [Departure]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 19, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 16, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.