U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-rj-00016
  • Case Name: Billups, Inc. v. O'Brien Advertising, Inc.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing/Conference]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Hearing/Conference]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 23, 2017: [Vacate]
  • October 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 19, 2017: [Continue]
  • October 02, 2017: [Strike]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 08, 2017: [Extension of Time]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Alter Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Order]
  • February 15, 2017: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release of Funds]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Release of Funds]
  • January 20, 2017: [Minute Order]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Deposit Funds]
  • January 04, 2017: [Deposit Funds]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.