U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-po-07020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Early Termination of Probation]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Order Modifying Conditions of Supervision]
  • May 15, 2017: [Probation Petition to Modify Conditions of Supervision]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 17, 2017: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.