U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-mc-00007
  • Case Name: DCD Partners, LLC et al v. Personal Involvement Center, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Order]
  • November 20, 2018: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Objection/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
  • January 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 10, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Transfer Case]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • June 01, 2017: [Vacate]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Minute Order]
  • May 02, 2017: [Transfer Case]
February, 2017
  • February 02, 2017: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 02, 2017: [Memorandum]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.