U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-mj-01048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Caro
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
  • October 20, 2017: [Leave to Restrict]
  • October 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 12, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
  • October 05, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 02, 2017: [Leave to Restrict]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Leave to Restrict]
  • September 05, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Continue]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 27, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 24, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 17, 2017: [Vacate]
  • March 09, 2017: [Detain]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.