U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-rj-00005
  • Case Name: Trustees of The National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Welfare Fund et al v. All-State Fire Protection, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • January 31, 2018: [Vacate]
  • January 29, 2018: [Minute Order]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • November 20, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Judgment]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
  • June 13, 2017: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.