U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-mc-00128
  • Case Name: DCD Partners, LLC et al v. North American National Marketing, LLC
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2017
  • August 04, 2017: [Dismiss]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 27, 2017: [Order]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • July 12, 2017: [Minute Order]
  • July 06, 2017: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.