U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-mj-07004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sauer
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • August 17, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • August 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 07, 2017: [Continue]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 03, 2017: [Order]
  • August 03, 2017: [Bond]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 17, 2017: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.