U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-mc-00137
  • Case Name: Dawson v. Reveal Energy Services Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Quash]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 28, 2017: [Extension of Time]
  • August 09, 2017: [Memorandum]
  • August 09, 2017: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 07, 2017: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.