U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-mj-07010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzales
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • January 04, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 01, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release of Brady Materials]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Consideration]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Consideration]
  • October 27, 2017: [In Limine]
  • October 27, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • October 27, 2017: [Brady Materials]
  • October 27, 2017: [Suppress ]
  • October 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 16, 2017: [Speedy Trial ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.