U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-mc-00169
  • Case Name: Standing Akimbo, LLC et al v. USA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 10, 2018: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Objection/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
  • August 07, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 22, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • January 03, 2018: [Clarify]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond]
  • November 09, 2017: [Minute Order]
  • November 08, 2017: [Memorandum]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Order]
  • October 27, 2017: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.