U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-mc-00189
  • Case Name: Switzer v. USA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • February 08, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • February 08, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
  • February 08, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
January, 2018
  • January 10, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Memorandum]
  • December 15, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • December 07, 2017: [Minute Order]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.