U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-mc-00192
  • Case Name: Application of LOUIS BACON for an Order
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 19, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Leave to Restrict]
  • February 15, 2019: [Leave to Restrict]
  • February 03, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • February 01, 2019: [Leave to Restrict]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Minute Order]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Quash]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 20, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 19, 2017: [Memorandum]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 13, 2017: [Quash]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order]
  • November 30, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 27, 2017: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.