U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-mc-00198
  • Case Name: Craftwood II, Inc. v. Wurth Louis & Company
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 08, 2018: [Memorandum]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Minute Order]
  • December 13, 2017: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 12, 2017: [Order]
  • December 06, 2017: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.