U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-mc-00200
  • Case Name: Coleman et al v. Weyerhaeuser Company
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Quash]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 14, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 24, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 16, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 04, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Memorandum]
  • December 27, 2017: [Order]
  • December 15, 2017: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.