U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-mj-01217-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Herrell
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 14, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Exclude]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Exclude]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 20, 2018: [Exclude]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • October 29, 2018: [Continue]
  • October 29, 2018: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • October 01, 2018: [Exclude]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • July 27, 2018: [Exclude]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • May 14, 2018: [Exclude]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Exclude]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 14, 2018: [Continue]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 11, 2018: [Exclude]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 15, 2017: [Exclude]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.