U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-mj-07014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dickson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 04, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Motion For Attorney Fees]
  • August 06, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Reduce Sentence]
March, 2018
  • March 01, 2018: [Continue]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 12, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • February 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 22, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 22, 2018: [Discovery]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 16, 2018: [Suppress ]
  • January 16, 2018: [Discovery]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 27, 2017: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.