U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-mc-00031
  • Case Name: Medicinal Wellness Center, LLC et al v. USA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • May 15, 2018: [File Excess Pages]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 09, 2018: [Minute Order]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 13, 2018: [File Excess Pages]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • February 14, 2018: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.