U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-mc-00051
  • Case Name: USA v. Matkari
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order]
  • December 31, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond]
March, 2019
  • March 31, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond]
  • March 19, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 11, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2018
  • May 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 08, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order to Show Cause]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Memorandum]
  • March 28, 2018: [Order]
  • March 26, 2018: [Enforce]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.