U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-po-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bryant
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Continue]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for 404(b) Evidence]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 16, 2018: [Continue]
  • April 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 05, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 05, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • April 05, 2018: [Suppress ]
  • April 05, 2018: [404(b) Evidence]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.