U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-po-07003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Salazar
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Continue]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 29, 2018: [Continue]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • May 02, 2018: [Withdraw Document]
  • May 01, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 26, 2018: [Vacate]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 17, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.