U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-po-07001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perozo
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 08, 2018: [Continue]
  • May 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 02, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.