U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-mc-00083
  • Case Name: LaborWorks Staffing Solutions, Inc. v. Preston et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order to Show Cause]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Show Cause]
  • May 10, 2018: [Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.