U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-mc-00175
  • Case Name: Franklin v. Howard Brown Health Center
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • January 11, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • January 11, 2019: [~Util - Pro Se survey deadline]
  • January 11, 2019: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • January 11, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 11, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 11, 2018: [Dismiss]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • November 19, 2018: [Vacate]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • October 17, 2018: [Memorandum]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Order]
  • September 04, 2018: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.