U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-mc-00178
  • Case Name: Standing Akimbo, Inc et al v. USA et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Leave]
  • August 06, 2021: [Strike]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Stay]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • December 26, 2018: [Stay]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Quash]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 29, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 09, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • November 06, 2018: [File Excess Pages]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 11, 2018: [Memorandum]
  • September 10, 2018: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.