U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-mc-00190
  • Case Name: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Hartman Wright Group, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Order]
  • February 05, 2019: [Contempt Order]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • January 28, 2019: [Vacate]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Show Cause]
  • January 18, 2019: [Show Cause]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • December 07, 2018: [Stay]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • November 16, 2018: [Vacate]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 12, 2018: [Extension of Time]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 02, 2018: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.