U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-mj-01181-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Maldonado et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 25, 2018: [Continue]
  • October 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 22, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 18, 2018: [APPEAL of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court-cr cases]
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 16, 2018: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.