U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-mc-00204
  • Case Name: Bowman v. Hudgins et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Recusal]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Reconsideration]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 20, 2018: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • December 20, 2018: [~Util - Pro Se survey deadline]
  • December 20, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 09, 2018: [Extension of Time]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order]
  • October 26, 2018: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.