U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-mc-00210
  • Case Name: Acosta v. Quality Construction, Inc.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Enforce]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order to Show Cause]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Memorandum]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 07, 2018: [Enforce]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.