U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-mj-01200-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carpenter et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 24, 2020: [Dismiss]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 09, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 07, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 09, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.