U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-mj-01202-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Iqbal et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 13, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order on FPD Motion for Issuance of Subpoena In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 24, 2019: [Issuance of Subpoena In Forma Pauperis- FPD]
  • January 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • January 15, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • January 14, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • December 05, 2018: [Extension of Time to Indict]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 29, 2018: [Continue]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 27, 2018: [Continue]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Stay]
  • November 09, 2018: [Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.