U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-mc-00212
  • Case Name: Luv N' Care, LTD. v. Laurain et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Amicus Brief]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
  • January 16, 2019: [File Amicus Brief]
  • January 16, 2019: [Leave to Restrict]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Minute Order]
  • November 20, 2018: [Memorandum]
  • November 19, 2018: [Minute Order]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 13, 2018: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.