U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-mc-00225
  • Case Name: Weddle v. Williams et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Transfer Case]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Intervene]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Minute Order]
  • January 10, 2019: [Transfer Case]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 04, 2019: [Memorandum]
  • January 03, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 13, 2018: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.