Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00007-1
    Party Name:USA v. Bueno
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Bond]
    Date Published:January 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unrestrict Case]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cod.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?185751
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =