Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:1:18-cr-00564-1
    Party Name:USA v. King Wall
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on FPD Motion for Issuance of Subpoena In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Issuance of Subpoena In Forma Pauperis- FPD]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Order]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Protective Order]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cod.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?185071
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =