U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-mc-00002
  • Case Name: Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc v. Center for Medical Progress, The
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 24, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • July 03, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 19, 2019: [Continue]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 15, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 01, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.