U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-mc-00003
  • Case Name: KeyBank National Association v. Winnerman et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Withdraw]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Memorandum]
  • February 20, 2019: [Leave]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 18, 2019: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.