U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-po-07010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dougherty
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 21, 2019: [Order]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 08, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order]
  • February 06, 2019: [Order on FPD Motion for Issuance of Subpoena In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 05, 2019: [Issuance of Subpoena In Forma Pauperis- FPD]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Discovery]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.