U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-mc-00004
  • Case Name: Martinez et al v. Social Security Administration Office of the Inspector General
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 24, 2019: [Discovery]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel]
  • May 09, 2019: [Appoint Pro Bono Counsel]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 11, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Order]
  • January 28, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 28, 2019: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • January 28, 2019: [Order]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.