U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-mj-00100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aguirre
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Order on Petition for Warrant/Summons of Offender Under Supervision]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Non-Guideline Sentence]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
  • April 05, 2019: [Leave to Restrict]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.