U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-mc-00032
  • Case Name: Fieldwood Energy, LLC et al v. Tengasco, Inc.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Transfer Case]
  • May 16, 2019: [Transfer Case]
  • May 16, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • May 16, 2019: [Quash]
  • May 09, 2019: [Minute Order]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 17, 2019: [Memorandum]
  • April 15, 2019: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.