open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00130-1
    Party Name:USA v. Xu et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Franks Hearing]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for 404(b) Evidence]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for James Hearing]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Discovery]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Suppress]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Produce]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to Restrict]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Compel]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Order]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:August 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Franks Hearing]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [404(b) Evidence]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [James Hearing]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Produce]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Disclosure]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress ]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Excuse]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Excuse]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.cod.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?187708
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =